Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mister Vincenzo Buonomo

Rector of the Pontifical Lateran University


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1961 Born
2 Jun 201857.1AppointedRector of the Pontifical Lateran University
1 Jul 201857.2InstalledRector of the Pontifical Lateran University

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Buonomo (VIAF: 18760537)
Mister Vincenzo Buonomo (born ) Rector of Pontifical Lateran University

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaeta

Please contact the Mister through the Pontifical Lateran University.

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast