Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosio Brandão, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Rosmen (Russionen, Rusköi)


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1519AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal
23 Dec 1519AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosmen (Russionen, Rusköi)
15 Jan 1559DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Ambrosio Brandão
Bishop Ambrosio Brandão O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto, Diocese of Porto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 288
  • b: CB, 17 Jul 2014
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 41*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Apr 2021

Quantcast