Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Monsignor Paul William Boyers

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Broome, Australia


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Sep 1979Ordained PriestPriest of Broome, Australia
10 Mar 2020AppointedAdministrator of Broome, Australia
28 Nov 2020AppointedApostolic Administrator of Broome, Australia
28 Aug 2021CeasedApostolic Administrator of Broome, Australia

MicroData Summary for Paul William Boyers
Monsignor Paul William Boyers , Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Broome

Please contact the Monsignor through the Diocese of Broome.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Aug 2021

Quantcast