Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreu (Andrés) de Bertrán

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1415AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
7 Jun 1419AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
4 Nov 1429AppointedAdministrator of Barcelona, Spain
18 Apr 1431AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
15 Jul 1433DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andreu (Andrés) de Bertrán
Bishop Andreu (Andrés) de Bertrán (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 128, and Page 262
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 102, and Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Apr 2021

Quantcast