Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Berkeley

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Dec 1326SelectedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
22 Mar 1327Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
24 Jun 1327DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Berkeley
Bishop James Berkeley (died ) Bishop of Exeter

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 243
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 73
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 371
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,766

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast