Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lamberto Balduino della Cecca, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1337AppointedBishop of Nemosia (Limasol), Greece
3 Nov 1344AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
3 Sep 1349DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lamberto Balduino della Cecca
Bishop Lamberto Balduino della Cecca O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Brescia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 367, and Page 147

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Jul 2021

Quantcast