Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Babana

Deceased

Bishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1915Born
18 Mar 193923.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 196852.3AppointedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
15 Sep 196852.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
9 Sep 197357.8DiedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Joseph Babana
Bishop Joseph Babana (born , died ) Bishop of Zaku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlquosh
Ordained BishopNotre Dame des Douleurs, Cathedral, Baghdad, Archdiocese of Baghdad (Chaldean)

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,392
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 691

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast