Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Avocati (Avvocati)

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jul 1301AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
1302¹ResignedBishop-Elect of Piacenza, Italy
19 Sep 1302AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
23 Aug 1303Ordained BishopBishop of Bologna, Italy
1322¹DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hubert Avocati (Avvocati)
Bishop Hubert Avocati (Avvocati) (died 1322) Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAnagni, Diocese of Anagni

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 140, and Page 401
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,807

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Aug 2021

Quantcast