Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Arrica

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1784Born
28 Dec 180925.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 183147.1SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
24 Feb 183247.5ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
1 May 183247.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
29 Jan 183954.4DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Arrica
Bishop Filippo Arrica (born , died ) Bishop of Alghero

EventPlace
Birth PlacePloaghe
Ordained BishopBosa, Diocese of Bosa

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 67
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1832, Number 14
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast