Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Scipione Ardoino Alcontres, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1715Born
8 Mar 173217.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
24 Oct 176752.7SelectedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
19 Dec 176752.8ConfirmedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
19 Dec 176853.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
5 Mar 176954.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
16 Nov 177055.7SelectedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
17 Jun 177156.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
5 May 177863.2DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Scipione Ardoino Alcontres (VIAF: 19160665148203362618)
Archbishop Scipione Ardoino Alcontres C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Ordained BishopSan Vito, Church, Barcellona Pozzo di Gotto, Archdiocese of Messina
Death PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 287, and Page 450
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,695
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 2
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,519
  • loc: AT, 14 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast