Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Arcioni

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateEventTitle
1380²AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
6 Feb 1387AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
10 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
1391¹ResignedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
1399²AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
12 Jun 1405AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
12 Jun 1405Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jul 1405³DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Arcioni
Antonio Cardinal Arcioni (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for .1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1405
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 111, and Page 100
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast