Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Celestine V

St. Pietro del Morrone (Angelerio), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1215Born
7 Jul 129479.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
29 Aug 129479.6Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
13 Dec 129479.9ResignedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 May 129681.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy
5 May 1313Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Pietro del Morrone (Angelerio)
Pope St. Pietro del Morrone (Angelerio) O.S.B. (born 1215, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Angelo Limosano
Ordained BishopSta Maria di Colmaggio, Church, L’Aquila, Diocese of L’Aquila

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
  • a pope for .4 years (Resigned)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,728
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,803

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast