Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal Amiel de Sarcenas, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1309¹Born
27 Apr 136253.3AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
9 Jan 136354.0AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
5 Sep 136556.6AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
18 Dec 137869.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
18 Dec 137869.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Aug 138980.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marco

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Amiel de Sarcenas
Pierre Cardinal Amiel de Sarcenas O.S.B. (born 1309, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarcenas, Diocese of Grenoble, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Celestines, Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 527, and Page 360
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Mar 2021

Quantcast