Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Tommaso d’Agni Lentini, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1255AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
1262²AppointedAdministrator of Messina, Italy
1266²ResignedAdministrator of Messina, Italy
18 Apr 1267AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
19 Mar 1272AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso d’Agni Lentini
Patriarch Tommaso d’Agni Lentini O.P. , Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 135, and Page 337
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 220, and Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast