Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Ucayali

Apostolicus Vicariatus Ucayali

Territory Lost

To: Vicariate Apostolic of San Ramón



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ucayali
5 February 1900ErectedDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Huánuco
Prefecture Apostolic of Ucayali (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ucayali
14 July 1925ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ucayali Vicariate Apostolic of Ucayali
2 March 1956Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ucayali Vicariate Apostolic of Pucallpa (erected)
2 March 1956Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ucayali Vicariate Apostolic of Requena (erected)
2 March 1956Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ucayali Vicariate Apostolic of San Ramón (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ucayali
1950120,000126,00095.2%123245,000356016ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 29 May 2013