Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Society of St. Paul
Paulines

(Institute of Consecrated Life)

Societas a Sancto Paulo Apostolo



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Institute of Consecrated Life
  • Founded: 20 August 1914
  • Clerical Religious Congregation
  • Official Web Site: http://www.stpauls.it/
  • Mailing Address: Via Alessandro Severo, 58, 00145 Roma, Italia
  • Telephone: 06.59.78.61
  • Fax: 06.59.78.66.02

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
20 August 1914FoundedSociety of St. Paul
10 May 1941Decretum LaudisSociety of St. Paul
27 June 1949ApprobationSociety of St. Paul

Statistics

YearReligious PriestsMale ReligiousParishesSource
1954735ap1955
19631,450ap1964
19661,600ap1967
19671,40172ap1968
19715091,25470ap1972
19745101,20074ap1975
19765331,20976ap1977
19775301,20277ap1978
19815661,19778ap1982
19865521,14988ap1987
19915661,21897ap1992
19955711,194104ap1996
20085471,024112ap2009
20105541,010110ap2011
20115481,001110ap2012
20125501,018108ap2013
20135481,020110ap2014
2014549997113ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015