Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bl. Giacomo Alberione, S.S.P. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Society of St. Paul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1884Born
29 Jun 190723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Alba (Pompea), Italy
27 Jun 194965.2IncardinatedPriest of Society of St. Paul
4 Apr 195773.0AppointedSuperior General of Society of St. Paul
5 Aug 196581.3RetiredSuperior General of Society of St. Paul
26 Nov 197187.6DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Society of St. Paul
20 Dec 2002Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Giacomo Alberione
Father Bl. Giacomo Alberione S.S.P. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Society of St. Paul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lorenzo di Fossano

  • a priest for 64.4 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018