Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dávid Zsolnay

Deceased

Bishop of Knin

Auxiliary Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1743³BornBeö
19 Dec 176724.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 180663.4SelectedBishop of Knin, Croatia
6 Oct 180663.7ConfirmedBishop of Knin, Croatia
6 Oct 180663.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary
8 Dec 180663.8Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary
4 Nov 181471.7DiedBishop of Knin, Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dávid Zsolnay:
Bishop Dávid Zsolnay (born , died ) Bishop of Knin

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 370
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013