Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sixt Werner von Vogt von Altensumerau und Prasberg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1575Born
2 Mar 162650.7SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
27 May 162650.9ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
29 Nov 162651.4Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
25 Nov 162752.4DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sixt Werner von Vogt von Altensumerau und Prasberg:
Bishop Sixt Werner von Vogt von Altensumerau und Prasberg (born , died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1626, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015