Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Anton Tritt von Wilderen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

Titular Bishop of Tiberias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1586³BornKonstanz
8 Apr 161326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
9 Sep 161933.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
9 Sep 161933.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
8 Feb 163952.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Anton Tritt von Wilderen:
Bishop Johann Anton Tritt von Wilderen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 25.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 336
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015