Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Valle de la Cerda, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹BornValladolid
19 Nov 163736.8AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
1638²37.0Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
5 Nov 163938.8SelectedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
17 Dec 164039.9ConfirmedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
22 Oct 164443.8DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Valle de la Cerda:
Bishop José Valle de la Cerda O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Badajoz

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 269, and Page 79
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 165, Number 1,037

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015