Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Youssef Tian (Tyen)

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1760BornBeirut
1784²23.8Ordained PriestPriest
1786²25.8AppointedBishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
6 Aug 178626.4Ordained BishopBishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
28 Apr 179636.1SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
24 Jul 179737.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
19 Nov 180848.7ResignedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
20 Feb 182059.9DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youssef Tian (Tyen):
Patriarch Youssef Tian (Tyen) (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,921
  • op/ab/ob/r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,979

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013