Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacinto Tarugi (Torisi), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1605BornOrvieto
5 Oct 165449.7AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
13 Dec 165449.9Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
2 May 167267.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
25 Mar 167469.1DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Tarugi (Torisi):
Archbishop Giacinto Tarugi (Torisi) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Venosa

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 278
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015