Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Simonin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Besanšon, France

Titular Bishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
17 Sep 160343.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besanšon, France
17 Sep 160343.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Corinthus
25 Apr 160444.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corinthus
1616²56.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Besanšon, France
26 Aug 163070.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Besanšon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Simonin
Bishop Guillaume Simonin (born 1560, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Besanšon

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoligny

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 164
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,604, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast