Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Schöner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Athyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569Born
23 Dec 159526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
28 Jul 160839.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Jul 160839.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Athyra
11 Jan 160940.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athyra
24 Sep 165182.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Schöner
Bishop Johann Schöner (born 1569, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeustadt/Aisch

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Mar 2014
  • bp/bd/op/ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018