Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Echter von Mespelbrunn

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1545BornMespelbrunn
1 Dec 157328.7AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
22 May 157530.2Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
9 Sep 161772.5DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Julius Echter von Mespelbrunn:
Bishop Julius Echter von Mespelbrunn (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Mar 2014
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 162

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Mar 2014