Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Feucht

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Athyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540BornPfullendorf
156323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
16 Jun 157232.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
16 Jun 157232.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Athyra
22 Jun 157232.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athyra
26 Apr 158040.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Jakob Feucht:
Bishop Jakob Feucht (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

  • a priest for 17.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 254
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 19, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Mar 2014