Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathurin Savary

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹Born
22 May 168250.3SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
24 Mar 169260.2ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
24 Aug 169260.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
19 Aug 169866.6DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mathurin Savary
Bishop Mathurin Savary (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 338
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018