Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Le Sauvage

Deceased

Bishop of Lavaur, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628¹Born
18 Dec 167345.9AppointedBishop of Lavaur, France
4 Feb 167446.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
17 May 167749.3DiedBishop of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René Le Sauvage
Bishop René Le Sauvage (born 1628, died ) Bishop of Lavaur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranville

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 406
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018