Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Muzio de Rosis

Deceased

Bishop of Teano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹Born
14 Jul 164240.5AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
20 Jul 164240.5Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
Sep 1654³52.6DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Muzio de Rosis
Bishop Muzio de Rosis (born 1602, died Sep 1654) Bishop of Teano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanova, Diocese of Novara
Ordained BishopMonache dell’Incarnazione, Chapel

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 331
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,642, Number 29
  • c34: AT, 10 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,077

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast