Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Isidore Robot, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of Indian Territory, Oklahoma, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1837Born
14 May 187638.8AppointedPrefect of Indian Territory, Oklahoma, USA
15 Feb 188749.5DiedPrefect of Indian Territory, Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for Isidore Robot
Father Isidore Robot O.S.B. (born , died ) Prefect of Indian Territory

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast