Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten (I)

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹Born
Mar 1587³37.1SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
17 Dec 160454.9SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
19 Dec 160555.9ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
28 May 160656.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
8 Oct 161363.7DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adrian von Riedmatten (I):
Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten (I) (born 1550, died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Dec 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 309
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015