Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. François de Sales

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1567BornThorens
18 Dec 159326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
15 Jul 160234.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
15 Jul 160234.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
17 Sep 160235.0SucceededBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
8 Dec 160235.2Ordained BishopBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
28 Dec 162255.3DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
28 Dec 1661Beatified
19 Apr 1665Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. François de Sales:
Bishop St. François de Sales (born , died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015