Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten (II)

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1610BornMünster
22 Sep 163221.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Feb 163322.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 164029.9SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 Oct 164232.0ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
21 Dec 164232.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
19 Sep 164635.9DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Adrian von Riedmatten (II):
Bishop Adrian von Riedmatten (II) (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 13.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 309
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013