Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Ricci, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1664AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
28 Sep 1664Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
28 Apr 1685DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Ricci
Bishop Francesco Antonio Ricci O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop of Bisceglie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369
  • b/c2: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast