Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Planca

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace, Italy

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jun 1517AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
3 May 1519Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
15 Jun 1519AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
15 Jun 1519AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
21 Aug 1534DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Planca
Archbishop Girolamo Planca (died ) Bishop of Gerace

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209, and Page 105
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 7
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,436

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast