Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Maria-Joseph-Julien Pichon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1816BornNeuilly-le-Vendin, France
13 Jun 184023.8Ordained PriestPriest
1844¹27.3ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Jan 186043.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}, China
24 Jan 186043.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
8 Sep 186145.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
12 Mar 187154.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Maria-Joseph-Julien Pichon:
Bishop Pierre-Maria-Joseph-Julien Pichon M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013