Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Maria Odescalchi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1656AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
19 Mar 1656Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
28 Aug 1666DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Maria Odescalchi
Bishop Giulio Maria Odescalchi O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComo, Diocese of Como

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 293
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast