Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Terence Albert O’Brien, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Emly, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Calama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601²Born
11 Mar 164746.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Emly, Ireland
11 Mar 164746.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
12 Apr 164847.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
31 Oct 165150.8DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Emly, Ireland
27 Sep 1992Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Terence Albert O’Brien
Bishop Bl. Terence Albert O’Brien O.P. (born 1601, died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Emly

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCappamore, Diocese of Limerick
Ordained BishopWaterford
Death PlaceDiocese of Limerick

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 128
  • c2: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 Aug 2020

Quantcast