Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques-Michel Naamo

Deceased

Patriarchal Vicar of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq

Titular Archbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1837¹Born
1863¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 188245.0AppointedBishop of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
20 Jun 188245.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Kerkūk (Chaldean), Iraq
24 Mar 188548.2AppointedBishop of Seert (Chaldean), Turkey
12 Jul 188548.5Ordained BishopBishop of Seert (Chaldean), Turkey
27 Apr 188851.3ResignedBishop of Seert (Chaldean), Turkey
27 Apr 188851.3AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq
27 Apr 188851.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bassorah {Basra} (Chaldean), Iraq
1895²58.0DiedPatriarchal Vicar of Baghdad (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Michel Naamo
Archbishop Jacques-Michel Naamo (born 1837, died 1895) Patriarchal Vicar of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossoul
Ordained BishopMossoul

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,348
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 143, and Page 514
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017