Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvestro Morosini

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹Born
14 Mar 163329.2AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
17 Apr 163329.2Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
1639¹35.0DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Morosini (VIAF: 304913024)
Bishop Silvestro Morosini (born 1604, died 1639) Bishop of Treviso

  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 329
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 31
  • ob/c2: AT, 27 Jul 2016
  • c2: AT, 3 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Sep 2016