Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matías de Moratinos y Santos

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616¹BornVillada
21 Jul 166448.6AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
28 Oct 166448.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
5 Aug 166953.6AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
3 Oct 167256.8AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
Sep 1682³66.7DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matías de Moratinos y Santos:
Bishop Matías de Moratinos y Santos , Bishop of Segovia

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 102, and Page 350
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 198, Number 1,242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013