Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ocampo, O.S. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Amyclae


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1660AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
3 Oct 1660Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
20 Jan 1684DiedTitular Bishop of Amyclae

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ocampo:
Bishop Francisco Ocampo O.S. (died ) Titular Bishop of Amyclae

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 81
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 191, Number 1,203
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015