Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Francesco Moia, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598¹BornMilan
1 Sep 165961.7AppointedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
5 Oct 165961.8Ordained BishopBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
13 Nov 167476.9DiedBishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Francesco Moia:
Bishop Pietro Francesco Moia C.R.S. (died ) Bishop of Telese o Cerreto Sannita

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 333
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013