Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Martínez de Luna y Pérez de Gotor

Deceased

Bishop

Note/Previous Titular See: (Antipope Benedict XIII)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1328¹Born
20 Dec 137547.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
20 Dec 137547.9Elevated to Cardinal
3 Oct 139466.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 139466.7Ordained BishopBishop
29 Nov 142294.9DiedBishop

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Martínez de Luna y Pérez de Gotor (VIAF: 79061954)
Pedro Cardinal Martínez de Luna y Pérez de Gotor (born 1328, died ) Bishop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIllueca

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
  • a cardinal for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1375
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,988
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 306, Number 175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast