Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony MacGeoghegan, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹Born
21 Sep 164449.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
11 Mar 164752.1AppointedBishop of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
12 Apr 164853.2Ordained BishopBishop of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
16 Apr 165762.2AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
Feb 1664²69.0ResignedBishop of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony MacGeoghegan
Bishop Anthony MacGeoghegan O.F.M. Obs. (born 1595) Bishop Emeritus of Meath

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWaterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore
Death PlaceCloonagh, Co. Westmeath
Buried Place (Original)Clonmacnoise, Diocese of Clonmacnoise

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 154, and Page 236
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 10
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 71
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Jul 2021

Quantcast