Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Lynch

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1647AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
19 Apr 1648Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
14 Jul 1663DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Walter Lynch
Bishop Walter Lynch (died ) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWaterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 154
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 11
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 Aug 2020

Quantcast