Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Kaspar von Leyen-Hohengeroldseck

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1618Born
1 Sep 164122.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jul 165031.5SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Trier, Germany
3 Jul 165132.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Trier, Germany
3 Jul 165132.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
7 Feb 165233.1SucceededArchbishop of Trier, Germany
10 Sep 165233.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 1652³33.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
1 Jun 167657.4DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Kaspar von Leyen-Hohengeroldseck
Archbishop Karl Kaspar von Leyen-Hohengeroldseck (born , died ) Archbishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrier

  • a priest for 23.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,426
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1652, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296, and Page 343
  • ob/c2+: ATh, 5 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018