Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Holler

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614¹Born
1652¹38.0Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
27 Aug 166349.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
27 Aug 166349.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
1 Jun 166450.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
20 Nov 167157.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Holler
Bishop Johannes Holler (born 1614, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEchternach

  • a priest for 19.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 106
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1664, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018