Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Cardinal Kempe

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note/Previous Titular See: (Santa Rufina only)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1380¹BornOllanfigh
21 Jun 141939.5AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
3 Dec 141939.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
28 Feb 142141.2AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 142141.9AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
20 Jul 142545.6AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 143960.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144060.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
21 Jul 145272.6AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
21 Jul 145272.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
22 Mar 145474.2DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Kempe:
Cardinal John Kempe (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 34.3 years
  • a cardinal for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 422, and Page 187
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 311, and Page 233
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,829
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 117
  • b/c3: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 23, and Page 245
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 295, and Page 566
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 110
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013